HI HB1578 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes the repeal of junior kindergarten, scheduled to take effect on July 1, 2014, pursuant to Act 178, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012.
Title
Junior Kindergarten
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-10 | House | Prefiled |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1578&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1578_.HTM |