HI HB1578 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Act 033, 06/06/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1133).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Act 033, 06/06/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1133).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Carbon Farming Task Force within the Office of Planning to identify agricultural and aquacultural practices to improve soil health and promote carbon sequestration in the State's agricultural and aquacultural sectors. Appropriates funds. (HB1578 CD1)
Title
Relating To Climate Change.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Act 033, 06/06/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1133). |
2017-06-08 | House | Act 033, on 06/06/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1133). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 141). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 141) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Creagan, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tupola. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 10:45AM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 10:45AM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Gabbard, Riviere Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Creagan, Lowen Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Tupola. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 670) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1571) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from ETT/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1157) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to ETT/AEN, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 210). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 924), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 363) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/AGR on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |