HI HB1579 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Lowers the level of light transmittance allowed on sun screening glazing on motor vehicle windows from thirty-five per cent to twenty per cent. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Windshield Tinting.
Sponsors
Rep. Darius Kila [D] | Rep. Cory Chun [D] | Rep. Rose Martinez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 334-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2320 (Same As) 2024-01-19 - Referred to TCA, JDC.