HI HB158 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a new department of tourism to assume the tourism-related functions of the department of business, economic development, and tourism. Effective 7/1/2010.
Title
Department of Tourism; Establishment
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to TCI/EBM, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=158&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB158_.HTM |