HI HB158 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens the scope of tuition assistance to Hawaii National Guard members working toward a degree on any campus of the University of Hawaii system with priority given under specified conditions. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB158 HD3)
Title
National Guard; Tuition Assistance ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HRE, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 184). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 787) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-12 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2, with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused. |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 293) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Ohno, Takumi, Fale. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-07-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Takumi, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-02-04 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 32) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2013-01-30 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Choy, Takayama; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 01-30-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to VMI, HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |