HI HB158 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB158
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period in which a county may adopt a surcharge on state tax, under certain conditions, from 3/31/2019 to 3/31/2022.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-02 | House | Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB457 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB158 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4
HB158 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=158&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB158_.HTM |