HI HB1596 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the invasive species rapid response special fund within DLNR. Establishes procedures for emergency declarations and expenditures. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Invasive Species; Mitigation and Eradication; Special Fund; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-04-16 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to AGR, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-15 | House | Prefiled. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1596&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1596_.HTM |