HI HB1597 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Act 160, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Act 160, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that members of the public may sue a board or alleged board after receiving an adverse Office of Information Practices decision, and that the decision will be reviewed de novo. Establishes a two-year statute of limitations to bring the lawsuit and reaffirms a complainant's right to seek review by the Office of Information Practices first. Recognizes that only a member of the public may recover attorney's fees and costs if that person prevails in an open meetings lawsuit. Requires that persons suing for open meetings law violations notify the Office of Information Practices about the lawsuit so that it may decide whether to intervene. Requires open meetings lawsuits that seek to void a board's final action to be prioritized by the courts. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Open Meetings.
Sponsors
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Elle Cochran [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | Act 160, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261). |
2024-07-03 | House | Act 160, on 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261). |
2024-04-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 764). |
2024-04-17 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garcia, Kila, Nakashima excused (3). |
2024-04-17 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 758). |
2024-04-16 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 501) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3695) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3275) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 189). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett, Holt, Kahaloa, Lowen, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Todd excused (9). |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 671-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Souza. |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-23-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |