HI HB1614 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Tourism Authority to offer performance-based incentives in all of its professional services contracts.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Tourism Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2075 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1614&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1614_.HTM |