HI HB162 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the offense of promoting a dangerous drug in the first degree to include possessing one or more preparations, compounds, mixtures, or substances of fifty or more capsules, tablets, ampules, dosage units or syrettes containing one or more dangerous drugs.
Title
Drugs; Promoting; Offense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB209 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=162&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB162_.HTM |