HI HB1620 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Require DOH, in conjunction with DHS and insurance commissioner, to conduct a study to determine the feasibility of an all-payer global budgeting pilot program for hospital care.
Title
Relating To Hospitals.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3256 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to HTH/HMS, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1620&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1620_.HTM |