HI HB1633 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-24 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-24 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the leasing restriction on owner-builders who obtain an owner-builder exemption to act as their own contractor and who build or improve residential or farm buildings or structures on property they own or lease and do not offer the buildings or structures for sale. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Contractors.
Sponsors
Rep. Luke Evslin [D] | Rep. Micah Aiu [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-09 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-09-24 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1358). |
2024-07-09 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1358). |
2024-06-21 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-24 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2024-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Elefante). Excused, 0 (none). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 43-24). |
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 43-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino. |
2024-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Ichiyama, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-24 11:00AM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-24 11:00AM; CR 224. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Evslin, Ichiyama, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Aquino. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 508) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Kim. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Elefante). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3670) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-28-24 9:40AM; CR 229. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-27-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3093) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HOU, CPN. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 199). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Kong voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett, Holt, Kahaloa, Lowen, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Todd excused (9). |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from HSG/WAL/JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 681-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-12 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-12 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-12 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Todd. |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL/JHA on Monday, 02-12-24 2:30PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HSG/WAL/JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2949 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPN.