HI HB1641 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - The committee(s) on LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - The committee(s) on LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the exclusive representative to negotiate benefits of the Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund. Allows disputes relating to benefits of, and amounts of contributions to, the Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund to be resolved by arbitration.
Title
Relating To Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1641&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1641_.HTM |