HI HB1644 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
For members of the Employees' Retirement System hired after June 30, 2012, includes overtime in the definition of compensation when an employee has been directed by their supervisor or an appropriate authority to work more than their normal hours of service to perform specific duties and tasks to serve the immediate well-being of the public due to a natural disaster under an active emergency proclamation. Specifies that overtime worked prior to July 1, 2024, shall not be included in pension calculations. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2). |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 277-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-06-24 9:15AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-24. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |