HI HB1647 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 1:45PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 1:45PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Services to compile information regarding employers with employees who receive public assistance. Requires the Department of Human Services to submit an annual report to the Legislature on the 50 employers with the highest number of employees receiving public assistance. Requires the Department of Land and Industrial Relations to share employment data. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 1:45PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-26-18 1:45PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Tokuda, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; Ihara. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Mizuno, Holt Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Ward. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 598) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3613) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | The committee on WAM will reconsider its previous decision on 04-04-18 and will hold a public decision making on 04-06-18 10:55AM in conference room 211. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HMS/LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3057) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, S. Chang. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Harimoto. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-18 3:15PM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HMS/LBR, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 49). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 826-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2018-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-13 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 307-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 02-07-18 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHS with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Ward excused (2). |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 18-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHS. |
2018-01-25 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2018-01-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 01-25-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to LAB, HHS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-11 | House | Prefiled. |