HI HB1647 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Public Utilities Commission to have electric utilities separately issue requests for proposals for firm renewable energy generation and requests for proposals for intermittent renewable energy generation. Prohibits the Public Utilities Commission from approving any new or renewed utilityowned generation project by a public utility or any new or renewed power purchase agreement for electricity generation with affiliated interests with a public utility. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2513 (Same As) 2022-02-22 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
Firm Renewable Requests for Proposals
Hawaii State Energy Office
Intermittent Renewable Requests for Proposals
PUC
Study
Firm Renewable Requests for Proposals
Hawaii State Energy Office
Intermittent Renewable Requests for Proposals
PUC
Study
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1647&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1647_.HTM |