HI HB165 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the dissemination of information from the juvenile justice information system to law enforcement agencies for purposes of the administration of law enforcement and law enforcement agency employment.
Title
Juvenile Justice Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-03 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-05-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB229 (Same As) 2015-02-03 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=165&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB165_.HTM |