HI HB1651 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Education and public charter schools to take certain steps to report incidents of harassment and implement procedures for handling harassment of educational workers. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To The Safety Of Educational Workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-24 3:02PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 80). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 760-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila. |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 1:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 561-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-14 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama. |
2024-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-08-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3). |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 70-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Quinlan. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 01-30-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to EDN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Department of Education
Educational Workers
Harassment
Protection and Workplace Safety
Public Charter Schools
Educational Workers
Harassment
Protection and Workplace Safety
Public Charter Schools