HI HB1663 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 11
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 11
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Applies the conditions and requirements relating to limited meeting to the Legislature when a house of the Legislature holds a limited meeting that is open to the public, as a guest of a board or community group. Repeals the Legislature's exemption from the open meeting requirements of the Sunshine Law.
Title
Relating To Transparency In State Government.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 11 |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to LMG, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-11 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2139 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - Referred to GVO/PSM/JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1663&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1663_.HTM |