HI HB1663 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility for, and automates, the expungement of conviction records if certain criteria are met. Beginning 12/1/2026, requires the Attorney General to issue automatic expungement orders and the Judiciary to seal or remove information from publicly accessible databases.
Title
Relating To Expungement Of Criminal Records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2706 (Same As) 2024-07-09 - Act 241, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1346).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1663&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1663_.HTM |