HI HB1669 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides funds to the judiciary for one judge and three support staff for the family court of the first judicial circuit. Effective 7/1/2030. Appropriation. (SD1)
Title
Family Court; Judge; Support Staff; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 325. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 3:30PM in Conference Room 325. |
2014-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-17 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-14 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Ing Co-Chairs; Kawakami, Thielen Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Hee Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 532) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3388) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:25AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2978) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 236). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 774-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2014-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-14 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 335-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Creagan, Kawakami, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Ito, C. Lee, McDermott. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-04-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-14 | House | Prefiled |