HI HB1674 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends eligibility for participation in state financial aid, University programs, and resident tuition to students of the University of Hawaii without lawful immigration status who meet certain specified criteria. (HB1674 HD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Immigration; Tuition; Financial Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-12 4:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Pine, Riviere voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Marumoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 440-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Nakashima, Aquino, Awana, Belatti, Chang, Hanohano, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Wooley, Ching; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-09-12 2:10PM in conference room 309. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 01-31-12 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-11 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2163 (Same As) 2012-01-20 - (S) Referred to EDU/JDL, WAM.