HI HB1676 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriate funds to the University of Hawaii to fulfill the requirements of Act 141, Session Laws of Hawaii 2022. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 350-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, La Chica, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Quinlan, Todd, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Marten. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-07-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |