HI HB1688 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to conduct a statewide needs assessment and establish an advisory council to determine what would be needed to transition to a more circular system with less waste generation, more reuse, and an extended producer responsibility program for packaging materials and paper products. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from AEN/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3338) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/CPN, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HWN/AEN, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 211). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1030-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-24 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia, Kong voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 501-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-13 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Woodson, Ward. |
2024-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-13-24 9:31AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-24. |
2024-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2368 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Advisory Council
Appropriation ($)
DOH
Expenditure Ceiling
Extended Producer Responsibility Program
Needs Assessment
Packaging Waste
Appropriation ($)
DOH
Expenditure Ceiling
Extended Producer Responsibility Program
Needs Assessment
Packaging Waste