HI HB1689 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends conservation and resources law to prohibit: (1) Commercial sales of parrotfish that have been caught by spearing; and (2) The spearing of parrotfish in state waters after sunset or before sunrise.
Title
Relating To Parrotfish.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-21-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1689&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1689_.HTM |