HI HB1703 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Ward excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Ward excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the month of September of each year as Suicide Prevention and Awareness Month.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Ward excused (2). |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 8-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-01-24 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2018-01-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 01-24-18 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-12 | House | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1703&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1703_.HTM |