HI HB171 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB171
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that no property shall be forfeited unless the owner or interest-holder of the property has been convicted of a covered offense or indicted for a covered offense and there is a significant risk that the property will be destroyed or otherwise made unavailable, and the State has met its rebuttable presumption for forfeiture. Requires the State to show by clear and convincing evidence that a claimant's interest in the property is subject to forfeiture.
Title
Relating To Forfeiture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB816 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC.
HB171 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1
HB171 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=171&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB171_.HTM |