HI HB172 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Superintendent of Education to reconstitute a public school, except a charter school that has been in restructuring for four or more school years and not advanced significantly toward improving academic performance as determined by a statistical analysis of academic data. Also allows the Superintendent to recommend to the charter school review panel actions that should be taken to reconstitute a charter school that has been in restructuring for three or more school years, and recommend that the charter school review panel revoke the charter school's charter. Effective 07/01/2020. (HB172 HD2)
Title
Schools; Reconstitution
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to EDH/LBR, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 62). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Bertram, Coffman, McKelvey voting no (3) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 837) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-02 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Har, Keith-Agaran, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman, C. Lee; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2009-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-02-09 3:30pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Evans, Mizuno, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Reported from EDN/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 268) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Souki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Pine. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Bertram, Chang, Nakashima, Rhoads, Yamane, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Berg, Hanohano, Manahan; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Shimabukuro, Ching. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-11-09 2:15 PM in conference room 309. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-11-09. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN-LAB on Wednesday, 02-04-09 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to EDN/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Pending introduction. |