HI HB1726 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires U-drive vehicles to pay the same fee for highway beautification and disposal of abandoned and derelict vehicles as non-U-Drive vehicles.
Title
Relating To Highway Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2124 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - Referred to TRS, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1726&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1726_.HTM |