HI HB173 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies the method by which the prices of school meals are determined.
Title
School Meals; Prices
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 115), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Berg, Bertram, Chang, Hanohano, Manahan, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Yamane, Ching, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Shimabukuro, Takai. | |
2009-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-02-09 2:00pm in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Pending introduction. |