HI HB1731 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants electric foot scooters the same rights and subjects them to the same duties as other vehicles, with certain exceptions. Applies blue light prohibition to electric foot scooters. Applies "vulnerable user" definition to include electric foot scooters. Amends "moped" definition to exclude electric foot scooters.
Title
Relating To Electric Foot Scooters.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2127 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1731&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1731_.HTM |