HI HB1743 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 086, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 086, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
For purposes of the Department of Health's authority to adopt rules concerning public health and safety, defines "pool" to mean a watertight artificial structure containing a body of water that does not exchange water with any other body of water either naturally or mechanically used for swimming, diving, recreational bathing, or therapy by humans. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Pools.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 086, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 086, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186). |
2022-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 767). |
2022-04-22 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Marten, Ohno, Tokioka excused (4). |
2022-04-22 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 744). |
2022-04-21 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-08-22. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 514). |
2022-04-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 716) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3748) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-31-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3307) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDC. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 31). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 693-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 529-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-15 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2022-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2804 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 24