HI HB1749 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies applicable reimbursement to the State or the defense for expert witness fees, as it pertains to testimony, preparation, and in-court attendance in state court criminal proceedings. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Witness Fees And Reimbursements In Criminal Cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:05AM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 296). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 999-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 373-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-10 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Nakashima. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-10-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-20 at 2:00PM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-20 at 2:00PM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-05-20 3:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2189 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.