HI HB1751 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of communication service fraud in the first and second degrees. Provides civil remedies. Authorizes forfeiture. Establishes evidentiary presumption. Adds definitions. (SD1)
Title
Communication Service Fraud; Civil Remedies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1048) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2009-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2009-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 03-20-09 1:15 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-18-09 1:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-03-13 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-18-09 1:15 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-03-13 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT, JGO. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to CPN, JGO. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 319). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Berg, Finnegan, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 677) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Karamatsu, Ito, Luke, Mizuno, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Morita. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-20-09 3:00pm in conference room 325. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-19-09. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-12-09 2:05 PM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |