HI HB1755 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds one at large member to the board of agriculture. Requires at least one at large member of the board of agriculture to have expertise in organic farming.
Title
Board of Agriculture; Membership; Organic Farming
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-03-14 9:40AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to AGR, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1755&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1755_.HTM |