HI HB1756 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the expungement of convictions, under certain circumstances, for certain offenses that are over 5 years old. (HB1756 HD1)
Title
Criminal Procedure; Expungement
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-10 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 168). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ching, Finnegan, Har, Marumoto, McKelvey, Pine, Thielen, Ward voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Ching, Finnegan, Marumoto voting no (3) and Representative(s) Bertram, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 540-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-25 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Herkes, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Wakai; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Luke, Mizuno, Morita, Souki, Thielen. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-25-10 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 2-25-10 at 2:00 PM . | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-23-10 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-23-10 at 2:00PM. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-16-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |