HI HB1756 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:30AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:30AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Statutorily establishes the Resources for Enrichment, Athletics, Culture, and Health program within the Office of Youth Services to provide after-school programs in public middle and intermediate schools. Establishes a special fund. Appropriates funds to establish the program and one full-time position. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Youth; After-school Programs; Resources for Enrichment, Athletics, Culture, and Health Program; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-16 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-22-14 4:15PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-15 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-16-14 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Carroll, Takumi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Fukumoto Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Tokuda, Ige Co-Chairs. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 550) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3358) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported from HMS/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2916) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Gabbard, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Taniguchi. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-14 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HMS/EDU, WAM. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 140). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 702-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-11 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 302-14), recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Awana, Choy, Ichiyama, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Say, Takai. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-05-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 50-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2014-01-28 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Morikawa, Oshiro, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-01-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 01-28-14 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2441 (Same As) 2014-03-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4).