HI HB1756 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Re-referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Re-referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Bans import, use, manufacture, sale, and storage of chlorpyrifos in the State. (HB1756 HD1)
Title
Relating To Pesticides.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Re-referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from EEP/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 270-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Gates; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Takayama, Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Say. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/AGR on Thursday, 02-08-18 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2456 (Same As) 2018-01-30 - Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, WAM.