HI HB1758 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Director of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to issue revenue bonds for qualified media infrastructure projects. Creates a special fund for disbursement of funds. Requires matching funds and post-audits. Effective July 1, 2112. (HB1758 HD1)
Title
Business Development in Hawaii; Motion Picture; Qualified Media Infrastructure Projects
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-12 1:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 78). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 894-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision-making on Thursday, 03-01-12 2:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-12 1:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5). | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 612-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-14-12 8:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) on ERB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-12. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 02-09-12 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-13 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2043 (Same As) 2012-02-15 - (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.