HI HB1773 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to PSM/HHS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to PSM/HHS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the law enforcement standards board to develop training materials related to the recognition and signs of Alzheimer's disease and related types of dementia. Requires law enforcement officers to review training materials for at least one hour per year. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Dementia.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HHS, WAM. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 90). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 793-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3). |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 78-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Nishimoto. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2552 (Same As) 2024-02-02 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.