HI HB180 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB180
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an education surcharge on residential investment properties and visitor accommodations for the purpose of funding public education. (HB180 HD2)
Title
Relating To Education Funding.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 684) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 159) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-06 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-17. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 02-03-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to EDN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB686 (Same As) 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
HB180 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
HB180 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).