HI HB1817 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires shopping centers having 15 or more retail tenants to have no less than 1 publicly available restroom. Effective 1/1/2022.
Title
Relating To Public Accommodations.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-01-22 1:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1817&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1817_.HTM |