HI HB1819 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation to acquire a privately owned portion of North Road and install lighting there. Appropriates funds for the acquisition and lighting. Appropriates funds as a grant-in-aid to the City and County of Honolulu to install lighting on the city-owned portion of North Road. (HB1819 HD1)
Title
Relating To North Road.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 153). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 989-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 670-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2018-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-14-18 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |