HI HB1855 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-28 - (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Cabanilla, Chang, Chong, Herkes, Ito, C. Lee, Sagum, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Luke, Thielen.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-28 - (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Cabanilla, Chang, Chong, Herkes, Ito, C. Lee, Sagum, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Luke, Thielen.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits electric utilities to recover costs and earn a 15% rate of return from ratepayers on investments and installations of voltage regulation technologies that meet specified standards.
Title
Public Utilities; Voltage Regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-28 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Cabanilla, Chang, Chong, Herkes, Ito, C. Lee, Sagum, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Luke, Thielen. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 1/28/10, 9:00 am. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-26-10 at 8:00 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 1 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-13 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1855&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1855_.HTM |