HI HB1861 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Act 064, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Act 064, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each number plate issued on or after 1/1/2025 to include an 'okina in the word "Hawai'i". Authorizes the use of all uppercase letters, all lowercase letters, or initial capital letters for the words "Hawai'i" and "Aloha State" in motor vehicle number plates. Limits application of special number plates for environmental conservation to electric vehicles. Specifies that the design for special number plates for environmental conservation does not require the words "Aloha State". (SD2)
Title
Relating To Number Plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | Act 064, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165). |
2024-06-24 | House | Act 064, on 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165). |
2024-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 831). |
2024-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Pierick excused (1). |
2024-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 828). |
2024-05-01 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tam, Tarnas, Kila Co-Chairs; Martinez, Alcos. |
2024-04-17 | House | Re-referred to CAI, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 523) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3801) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Kidani. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-24 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3223) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TCA, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 243). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 886-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-16 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama, Holt, Souza. |
2024-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-16-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 251-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Sayama. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-07-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2201 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
City and County of Honolulu Mayor's Package
Electric Vehicles
Hawaiian Diacritical Marks
Motor Vehicles
Number Plates
Electric Vehicles
Hawaiian Diacritical Marks
Motor Vehicles
Number Plates