HI HB1871 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a person authorized to collect rent for another person is not required to pay the general excise tax on behalf of the owner. Specifies that transient accommodations brokers are not required to pay the transient accommodations tax unless acting as an operator. Specifies that advertisements through transient accommodations brokers are subject to advertising requirements.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2639 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to CPH/ETT, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1871&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1871_.HTM |