HI HB1872 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the operation, repair, maintenance, and improvement of the East Kauai irrigation system by the East Kauai Water Users' Cooperative.
Title
East Kauai Water Users' Cooperative; Agriculture; Irrigation; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2217 (Same As) 2016-07-01 - Act 174, 06/30/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1872&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1872_.HTM |