HI HB1872 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to recognize that game mammals and game birds provide a food source, that striking an appropriate balance between the management of game mammal and game bird populations and sustainability of the animals' natural habitats to reduce negative impacts to important watershed areas is a priority, and that the State's unique relationship with the ocean requires careful consideration and management of land and ocean activities that prioritize the public trust responsibilities of the State. Requires each department, office, or agency of the State to update the department, office, or agency's rules and policies to integrate the local hunting and fishing industries into any food security or sustainability strategies that department, office, or agency employs. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Sustainability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Lowen voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 17-22). |
2022-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 17-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Gabbard, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-26-22 3:30PM in conference room 016. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Branco Co-Chairs; B. Kobayashi, Kong, McDermott. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 872). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Gabbard, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 801) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3857) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3502) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 1:50PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 44). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Lowen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 766-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Branco. |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Lowen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 581-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-15 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, Ohno, McDermott. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-15-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2069 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - Referred to AEN/HWN/WTL, WAM.
Subjects
Conservation
DLNR
Food Security
Gaming and Fishing Resources
Report
Rules and Policies
State Departments
Sustainability
DLNR
Food Security
Gaming and Fishing Resources
Report
Rules and Policies
State Departments
Sustainability