HI HB1879 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Act 014, 05/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Act 014, 05/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain information to be included in any digital voter information guide shall not be released to any requestor in whole or in part before the public release of the entire guide. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Digital Voter Information Guide.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Act 014, 05/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114). |
2024-05-03 | House | Act 014, on 05/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 764). |
2024-04-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-04-17 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garcia, Kila, Nakashima excused (3). |
2024-04-17 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 757). |
2024-04-16 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-05-24. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2024-04-05 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 478) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3417) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 246). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett, Holt, Kahaloa, Lowen, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Todd excused (9). |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 646-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 01-30-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2232 (Same As) 2024-01-18 - Referred to JDC.