HI HB1883 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 166, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 166, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the exterior of the envelope containing the ballot package for elections by mail to include instructions on how to obtain language translation services in Hawaiian and certain other non-English languages. Applies to all elections beginning with the 2024 primary election. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 166, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 166, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267). |
2022-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904). |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Ihara Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Misalucha, Fevella. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 767). |
2022-04-22 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Marten, Ohno, Tokioka excused (4). |
2022-04-22 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 746). |
2022-04-21 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 802) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3884) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-31-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3338) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 162). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 843-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 371-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Lowen, Ward. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-03-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2161 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24